Kovesi, Thomas Andrew (CPSO#: 55431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2868
Fax: (613) 738-4886
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Kovesi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kovesi ( CPSO# 55431 )
Dr. N. Fellegi ( CPSO# 58372 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ANDREW KOVESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVESI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990