Kowalchuk, Glenn (CPSO#: 63987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
448 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 7V3
Phone: (905) 988-1323
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Kowalchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kowalchuk ( CPSO# 63987 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
448 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 7V3
Phone Number: (905) 988-1323

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN KOWALCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWALCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992