Kozanitis, Chris Denis (CPSO#: 84425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone: (613) 766-0318
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 sutherland drive
Kingston ON  K7K 5V6
Canada
Phone: 613 766 0318
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.D. Kozanitis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kozanitis ( CPSO# 84425 )

Business Address:
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS DENIS KOZANITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZANITIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008