Koziol, Kathie Anne Stephanie (CPSO#: 53011)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1988