Kozma, David John (CPSO#: 66336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth Hospital
P O Box 6600
Charlottetown PE  C1A 8T5
Phone: (902) 894-2111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN KOZMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expiry date attached to Certificate of Registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1994