Kozner, Alice Suzanne (CPSO#: 16866)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1958
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 May 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2009

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Jan 2001
Summary:

On January 8, 2001 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kozner’s plea of guilty and found her 
guilty of failing without reasonable cause to provide a report or certificate relating to an 
examination or treatment performed to the patient or his or her authorized representative within a 
reasonable time after the patient or his or her authorized representative has requested such a 
report or certificate; and in that she was guilty of unprofessional conduct. 
 
Subsequently the Committee ordered the following:  
 
  (a)  the attendance by Dr. Kozner before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact 
       of the reprimand to be recorded on the register; 
  (b)  the suspension of Dr. Kozner’s certificate of registration for a period of six months, to 
       commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar within 60 days of this order                    
       becoming final; and 
  (c)  three months of Dr. Kozner’s suspension referred to in paragraph (b) above will be               
       suspended if Dr. Kozner: 
         (i)    retains an assessor acceptable to the Registrar at her own expense; 
        (ii) successfully completes any remediation and reassessment required by the assessor, at 
             her own expense; 
        (iii) funds and co-operates with annual inspections of her practice by the assessor  or 
             another person appointed by or acceptable to the Registrar for a period of  three 
             years; 
        (iv) should Dr. Kozner cease private practice at any time prior to the end of the 
              inspection periods referred to in (iii) above, but participate in any professional  activity 
             whether by consulting or employment, Dr. Kozner shall advise the  College that she 
             has ceased to engage in private practice, and provide the  College     with a written 
             undertaking that she will advise the College in advance of her returning     to private 
             practice, at which time the three year period of annual inspections referred     to in 
             paragraph 3 above shall recommence. While not in private practice, Dr. Kozner    shall 
             provide the College with an annual report from any school board or other body    to 
             whom she provides consulting or other professional services, or by which she is    
             employed, indicating that she is meeting her obligations in a timely manner.  
             
  (d)  Costs shall be paid to the College by Dr. Kozner in the amount of         $10,000.00 
       on or before March 8, 2001.
            (iv)   should Dr. Kozner cease private practice at any time prior to the end of the 
                   inspection periods referred to in (iii) above, but participate in any professional 
                   activity  whether  by  consulting  or  employment,  Dr.  Kozner  shall  advise  the 
                   College  that  she  has  ceased to  engage  in  private  practice,  and  provide  the 
                   College          with  a  written  undertaking  that  she  will  advise  the  College  in 
                advance of her returning     to private practice, at which time the three year period 
                of annual inspections referred     to in paragraph 3 above shall recommence. While 
                not in private practice, Dr. Kozner    shall provide the College with an annual report 
                from any school board or other body    to whom she provides consulting or other 
                professional services, or by which she is    employed, indicating that she is meeting 
                her obligations in a timely manner. 
             
      (d) Costs shall be paid to the College by Dr. Kozner in the amount of         $10,000.00 
on or before March 8, 2001. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 08, 2001