Kozyra, Lesia Maria Anna (CPSO#: 66998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2052 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1E6
Phone: (613) 845-0084
Fax: (613) 845-0079
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesia Kozyra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kozyra ( CPSO# 66998 )

Business Address:
2052 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 845-0084

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESIA MARIA ANNA KOZYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZYRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995