Krackovitch, Stephanie (CPSO#: 74744)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Krackovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 200 955 St Jean Boulevard Pointe Claire, QC H9R 5K3
Date Received: 29 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014