Kraemer, William Joseph (CPSO#: 60915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 483-1444
Fax: (416) 483-8856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Kraemer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Palda ( CPSO# 60728 )
Dr. W. Kraemer ( CPSO# 60915 )

Business Address:
Suite 604
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 483-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOSEPH KRAEMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAEMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990