Kraft, Claudia Suzanne (CPSO#: 90495)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2009 to 12 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2015