Kraft, John Nelson (CPSO#: 84674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Main St. Markham N.
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone: (905) 472-9950
Fax: (905) 472-3366
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Canada
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6206
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jouni Kraft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 29284 )
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 84674 )

Business Address:
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000


Corporation Name: Kraft & Lynde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lynde ( CPSO# 90834 )
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 84674 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-6222

Business Address:
25 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone Number: (905) 472-9950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NELSON KRAFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011