Kraft, Jouni Paavo (CPSO#: 29284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1977

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jouni Kraft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 84674 )
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 29284 )

Business Address:
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOUNI PAAVO KRAFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAFT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1977

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)