Kraftcheck, Erin Rachel (CPSO#: 84287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto Mississauga
Health & Counselling Centre
DV1123A-3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone: (905) 828-5255
Fax: (905) 828-3852
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Apr 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN RACHEL KRAFTCHECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAFTCHECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2009