Krahn, Andrew David (CPSO#: 61524)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Krahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2012