Krajbich, Joseph Ivan (CPSO#: 28473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shriners Hospital For Children
3101 SW Sam Jackson Park Road
Portland OR  97239
United States
Phone: (503) 221-3424
Fax: (503) 221-3490

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alaska
USA - Oregon
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH IVAN KRAJBICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJBICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976