Krajden, Mel (CPSO#: 57445)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005