Krajden, Sigmund (CPSO#: 27170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 0
Fax: (416) 530-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen-Krajden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Krajden ( CPSO# 27170 )
Dr. J. Cohen ( CPSO# 27177 )

Business Address:
80 Shelborne Avenue
Toronto ON  M3N 1Z3
Phone Number: (416) 782-5107

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 03 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIGMUND KRAJDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJDEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1975