Krajewski, Adam (CPSO#: 57651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Toronto ON  M3N 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Krajewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krajewski ( CPSO# 57651 )

Business Address:
Humber River General Hospital
Finch Site
2111 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 747-3748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM KRAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995