Kramarchuk, Markijan Walter (CPSO#: 66490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
2560 Matheson Boulevard East
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y9
Phone: (905) 712-3626
Fax: (905) 712-4265
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. W. Kramarchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kramarchuk ( CPSO# 66490 )

Business Address:
120 - 2560 Matheson Boulevard East
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y9
Phone Number: (905) 712-3626

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKIJAN WALTER KRAMARCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAMARCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995