Kramer, Barry Nathan (CPSO#: 57153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6882
Fax: (705) 740-6891
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY NATHAN KRAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987