Krane, Sam Donald (CPSO#: 33150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
2249 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone: (613) 236-3443
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM DONALD KRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1982