Kranemann, Christoph Friedrich (CPSO#: 62200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Phone: (416) 289-4000
Fax: (416) 289-2318
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kranemann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kranemann ( CPSO# 62200 )

Business Address:
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 445-8439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPH FRIEDRICH KRANEMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRANEMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1993