Kranenka, Joan Vivian (CPSO#: 64100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: Parsons, Joan (used until: 07 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 2015