Krasnik, Catherine Eva (CPSO#: 85546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1325 White Cedar Trail
Burlington ON  L7P 4T1
Phone: 905 572 1838
Fax: 289 337 5419
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Krasnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Krasnik ( CPSO# 85546 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE EVA KRASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRASNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011