Krasovec, Barbara (CPSO#: 64019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovenian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
901 3rd Avenue East
Suite 209
Owen Sound
Ontario
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2K7
Phone: (519) 416-3103
Fax: (519) 416-3104
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA KRASOVEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRASOVEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992