Kratky, Vladimir (CPSO#: 51434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Room 262D
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2169
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kratky O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. O'Connor ( CPSO# 56852 )
Dr. V. Kratky ( CPSO# 51434 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Medical Clinic Urgent Care Centre
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 389-3348


Corporation Name: Kratky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kratky ( CPSO# 51434 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Room 262D
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VLADIMIR KRATKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRATKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1985