Kraulis, John Erik (CPSO#: 26711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 415 - 1 Ripley Avenue Toronto ON M6S 4Z6
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018