Krause, Richard Adam (CPSO#: 66421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
Operating Room
189 Elm Street
P O Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2063
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ADAM KRAUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995