Kravetz, Arnold Israel (CPSO#: 28335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 112
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-1617
Fax: (416) 746-1619
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arnold I. Kravetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kravetz ( CPSO# 28335 )

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 112
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 746-1617

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNOLD ISRAEL KRAVETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976