Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kravis, Marc John Margeris (CPSO#: 59456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Annex Medical Imaging
304 - 800 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3M8
Phone: (416) 531-1128
Fax: (416) 531-1127
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

206 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Canada
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: (519) 767-2699
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007


Corporation Name: Marc Kravis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kravis ( CPSO# 59456 )

Business Address:
Annex Medical Imaging
304 - 800 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3M8
Phone Number: (416) 531-1128

Business Address:
206 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 767-0220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC JOHN MARGERIS KRAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1989