Kravitz, Elliot (CPSO#: 50744)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996