Kravtsenyuk, Maryana Hryhorivna (CPSO#: 107361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Duchcherer, Maryana Hryhorivna (used until: 08 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Medical University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TBRHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maryana Duchcherer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kravtsenyuk ( CPSO# 107361)

Business Address:
TBRHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYANA HRYHORIVNA KRAVTSENYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVTSENYUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015