Kraw, Nicholas Michael (CPSO#: 25750)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Western Australia, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 2011