Krawczuk, Daniel Metro (CPSO#: 58259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 105 1122 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone: (705) 470-7171
Fax: (705) 470-7272
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krawczuk ( CPSO# 58259 )

Business Address:
105 - 1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 470-7171


Corporation Name: Fredette and Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krawczuk ( CPSO# 58259 )
Dr. P. Fredette ( CPSO# 69909 )

Business Address:
Dr. Paul Fredette - Family Medicine
18A - 3140 Highway 69 North
Val Caron ON  P3N 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 222-1888

Business Address:
Suite 105
1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 566-5151


Corporation Name: D. M. Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krawczuk ( CPSO# 58259 )

Business Address:
105 - 1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 470-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL METRO KRAWCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAWCZUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988