Krayacich, Nicholas Charles (CPSO#: 61144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LaSalle Community
Health Care Centre
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Krayacich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Krayacich ( CPSO# 61144 )

Business Address:
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 734-1234

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS CHARLES KRAYACICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAYACICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1990