Krayem, Ayman Badr Ahmad (CPSO#: 75633)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004