Kreder, Hans Jurgen (CPSO#: 55502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
MG365
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6816
Fax: (416) 480-5886
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hans J. Kreder Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kreder ( CPSO# 55457 )
Dr. H. Kreder ( CPSO# 55502 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Room MG 365
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6816

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS JURGEN KREDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986