Kreder, Marion Rita (CPSO#: 55457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: Diston, Marion Rita (used until: 23 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 - 123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: (416) 743-1358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hans J. Kreder Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kreder ( CPSO# 55502 )
Dr. M. Kreder ( CPSO# 55457 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Room MG 365
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6816

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARION RITA KREDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1987