Kreichman, Daniel (CPSO#: 77946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone: (416) 644-1404
Fax: (416) 644-1406
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kreichman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kreichman ( CPSO# 77946 )

Business Address:
100 - 36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 644-1404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KREICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREICHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007