Kreidstein, Sharon Helene (CPSO#: 62528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 743-6372
Fax: (416) 741-2276
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416)242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Kreidstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kreidstein ( CPSO# 62528 )

Business Address:
502 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-6372

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 19 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON HELENE KREIDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREIDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991