Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kreindler, David Michael (CPSO#: 69170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cincinnati, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue. Room FG-53b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5328
Fax: (416) 480-6818
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Kreindler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kreindler ( CPSO# 69170 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room EG-46
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL KREINDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREINDLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2000