Kremer, Sidney Gregory Jordan (CPSO#: 66624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Suite 220
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone: (905) 858-4883
Fax: (905) 858-4839
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
Cardio Pulmonary Department
3Rd Floor Carlo Fidani Building
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4060
Fax: (905) 813-4046
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY GREGORY JORDAN KREMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1998