Krepinsky, Joan Caroline (CPSO#: 70463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Room T3311
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34991
Fax: (905) 540-6589
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan Krepinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Krepinsky ( CPSO# 70463 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
T3311 - 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN CAROLINE KREPINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREPINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2000