Kribs, Stewart Wayne (CPSO#: 60887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 54965
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Radiology
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519 685-8300
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stewart Kribs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kribs ( CPSO# 60887 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEWART WAYNE KRIBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIBS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990