Kriger, Frank Louis (CPSO#: 52908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As from December 9, 2015, the following voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking
            by Dr. Frank Louis Kriger is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the
            certificate of registration held by Dr. Kriger:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. FRANK LOUIS KRIGER
                                            ("Dr. Kriger")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
            _______________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Kriger, certificate of registration number 52908, am a member of
                  the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the
                  requirement to participate in a program of continuing professional
                  development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Kriger, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am
                  entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  Continuing Professional Development requirement under section 29 of
                  Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Kriger, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Kriger, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance
                  Plan ("OHIP") that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered
                  after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees
                  that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. If I do not have an active OHIP billing number, I undertake
                  to provide proof of same to the College.

            (5)   I, Dr. Kriger, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to
                  return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Kriger, undertake to comply with the provisions and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Kriger has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario
                        and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice
                        or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Kriger, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Kriger, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: August 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On August 16, 2017, the Maryland State Board of Physicians, with the agreement of Dr. Frank L. Kriger, made a Consent Order ordering Dr. Kriger to be reprimanded for failure to provide details of a patient’s medical record to the patient or another physician, on proper request as required by Maryland law. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated September 6, 2017.


Source: Member
Active Date: December 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frank Louis Kriger to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 9, 2015:

Dr. Kriger has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.