Krishna, Dinesh Ram (CPSO#: 86006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Dinesh Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krishna ( CPSO# 86006 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital ED
4001 Leslie Avenue
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINESH RAM KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013