Krishna, Popuri Murali (CPSO#: 78690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8036
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puranam Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Krishna ( CPSO# 78690 )
Dr. P. Popuri ( CPSO# 78917 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POPURI MURALI KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2008