Krishnadev, Upasana (CPSO#: 88524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SickKids CCMH
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone: 416-924-1164 Ext. 3101
Fax: 416-924-8208
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

NEOFACS
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1G2
Canada
Phone: (705) 335-2445
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

The George Hull Centre
for Children and Families
81 The East Mall, Third Floor
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Fax: 416-622-7068
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Upasana Krishnadev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Krishnadev ( CPSO# 88524 )

Business Address:
81 The East Mall
Third Floor
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone Number: (416) 622-8833

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
NEOFACS
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1G2
Phone Number: (705) 335-2445

Business Address:
The Hincks-Dellcrest Centre
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 924-1164

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UPASANA KRISHNADEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNADEV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013