Krishnakumar, Vasu (CPSO#: 42658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011