Krishnalingam, Chinniah (CPSO#: 63346)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 08 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seen between 1997 and March 2015 please write to: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital 10 Trench Street Richmond Hill, ON L4C 4Z3 Patients seen between Mary 21, 2015 and December 18, 2015 please write to: 10 Ardmore Crescent Richmond Hill, ON L4B 2H7
Date Received: 21 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Dec 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Feb 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2016
Summary:

On February 8, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, 
and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Krishnalingam did not contest the allegations. 
 
Dr. Krishnalingam, a psychiatrist who had a certificate of registration with the College until he 
resigned it on December 21, 2015, treated Patient A on at least 26 separate occasions between 
2011 and 2012. The treatment took place at a hospital where Patient A attended the hospital’s 
 mental health program between May and June 2011. Patient A had a history of abuse and 
 depression. 
  
 During appointments, Dr. Krishnalingam asked Patient A insensitive and inappropriate questions 
 about her sex life, including how many times per week she had sex with her husband. Dr. 
 Krishnalingam also suggested that Patient A’s husband had engaged in extramarital sex because 
 she did not have sex with him often enough. Dr. Krishnalingam advised that she should have sex 
 with her husband more often so that he would not have to ‘go elsewhere’ for sex. 
  
 Dr. Krishnalingam also made inappropriate comments about Patient A’s appearance, including 
 telling Patient A she was a very beautiful woman and that her lips were very sexy. Dr. 
 Krishnalingam grabbed and hugged Patient A on several occasions despite her clear indications 
 on each occasion that she did not consent to physical contact.  
  
 On one occasion, at the end of a session as Patient A was leaving, Dr. Krishnalingam grabbed 
 and hugged her with both arms, pressing his chest against hers. Dr. Krishnalingam attempted to 
 kiss Patient A during this hug; she pushed him away and turned her head to the side such that his 
 lips touched her cheek. 
  
 On several occasions Dr. Krishnalingam asked Patient A to attend the hospital on weekends 
 when he was on call. When she asked why, he indicated so they could be alone and would not be 
 disturbed. He gave his personal phone number to her and asked that she call him to arrange 
 meetings while he was on call at the hospital. Patient A did not call him on his personal phone 
 number or see him when he was on call. During follow-up appointments Dr. Krishnalingam 
 inquired as to why she was not coming to see him when he was on call and again indicated 
 nobody else would be present on the floor, they would be alone together, and they could talk and 
 get to know one another. 
  
 During sessions with Patient A, Dr. Krishnalingam failed to maintain patient confidentiality by 
 leaving patient files out on his desk such that Patient A could see the patients’ names, dates of 
 birth, medications, and other personal health information.  
  
 On at least one occasion, Dr. Krishnalingam disclosed to Patient A that he was being 
 investigated by the College and asked whether she had reported him.  
  
 Counsel for the College made a submission on penalty that counsel for Dr. Krishnalingam did 
 not oppose.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar revoke Dr. Krishnalingam’s certificate of registration effective 
      immediately; 
2.    Dr. Krishnalingam appear before the panel to be reprimanded; 
3.    Dr. Krishnalingam reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the 
     program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of 
     credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts 
     within thirty (30) days of the date this Order becomes final, in the amount of $16,060; 
      and 
4.    Dr. Krishnalingam pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,000 within 30 days of the 
      date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8, 2016


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Sep 2005
Summary:

 On September 12, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Krishnalingam to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 the following:
1.	the Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Krishnalingam(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months effective immediately.

2.	the 
 Discipline Committee directs Dr. Krishnalingam to appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.	the Discipline Committee orders Dr. Krishnalingam to pay to the College costs in 
 the amount of $4,750.00.

4.	the Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be 
 included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 12, 2005

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 22, 2017:

Dr. Krishnalingam’s certificate of registration was revoked by Order of the Discipline Committee on February 8, 2016.

Dr. Krishnalingam was the subject of two additional College investigations into whether he sexually abused two patients. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Krishnalingam has agreed that he will never, in any jurisdiction, practice medicine, be registered as a physician, apply or re-apply for registration as a physician, or seek reinstatement of his certificate of registration.
Download Full Document (PDF)